Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nord, Peter William (CPSO#: 58091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3618
Fax: (416) 285-3670
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Nord Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nord ( CPSO# 58091 )

Business Address:
Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 285-3666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM NORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004