Nordal, Robert Allan (CPSO#: 74238)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 27 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004