Noriega, Eleazar Humberto (CPSO#: 29208)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 17 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1977
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 14 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 21 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 16 Feb 2014
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 17 Jul 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Nov 2014
Summary:

On November 3, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eleazar Humberto 
Noriega committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual 
impropriety with a patient and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Noriega inappropriately rubbed the clitoris of a teenage 
female patient during a medical appointment at a teen health clinic in 1979.  
 
On November 25, 2014, Dr. Noriega appealed the decision on finding of the Discipline 
Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). 
 
On July 17, 2015, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
- The Registrar revoke Dr. Noriega’s certificate of registration, effective immediately; 
- Dr. Noriega appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, and that the reprimand be 
recorded on the register; and 
- Dr. Noriega pay costs to the College in the amount of $40,140.00, based on nine hearing 
days at the tariff rate of $4,460.00 per day. 
 
On October 20, 2015, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Noriega’s application to stay 
the penalty decision of the Discipline Committee pending the disposition of his appeal. 
Therefore, the revocation of Dr. Noriega’s certificate of registration remains in effect. 
 
On March 8, 2016, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Noriega’s appeal and ordered him 
to pay costs in the amount of $10,000 to the College.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 08 Mar 2016
Hearing Date(s): March 24-26, 28, 2014 and April 7-10, 2014


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Feb 2013
Summary:

On February 28, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eleazar Humberto Noriega 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
In 2009, Dr. Noriega was referred to the Discipline Committee for allegations, including sexual 
abuse and sexual impropriety. On July 22, 2009, Dr. Noriega entered into an undertaking with 
the College and undertook, among other things, not to engage in any professional encounters 
with female patients except in the presence of his practice monitor. He undertook to post a sign 
in his waiting room and in each of his examination rooms notifying the public of this practice 
restriction. Dr. Noriega's practice monitor also entered into an undertaking on July 22, 2009. It 
required the practice monitor to be present for all of Dr. Noriega's professional encounters with 
female patients.  
 
Dr. Noriega engaged in professional misconduct based on the following failures to comply with 
his undertaking:  
 
      Dr. Noriega failed to post the required sign in the waiting room, which includes the 
      obligation to take reasonable steps to ensure that the sign remains posted; 
      Dr. Noriega failed to post the required sign in an examination room, including covering 
      up the required sign with a framed picture; 
      Dr. Noriega failed to have a chaperone present throughout the entirety of his patient 
      encounters between July 2009 and February 2010; and 
      Dr. Noriega misled the College's compliance investigator in February 2010 when he told 
      her that he doesn't see female patients in the consultation room. 
 
On July 17, 2013, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Noriega's certificate of registration for a period of 6 (six) 
      months. The date of commencement of the suspension shall be 30 days after the date of 
      release of this decision. 
 
2.    Dr. Noriega attend before the Committee to be reprimanded. 
 
On August 22, 2013, the Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Noriega to pay costs to the College in 
the amount of $14,600.00 by August 31, 2014. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 17-19, September 5, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Jul 2011
Summary:

On July 18, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eleazar Humberto Noriega 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual 
impropriety with a patient and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
In 1979, Dr. Noriega inappropriately rubbed the clitoris of a 16-year-old female patient 
during a medical appointment at a teen health clinic.  
 
On September 13, 2011, Dr. Noriega appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee 
to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).  
 
On December 7, 2011, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
   1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Noriega’s certificate of registration, effective two weeks 
      from the date of this Order. 
       
   2. Dr. Noriega appear before the Panel to be reprimanded, on a date to be fixed by 
      the Panel, which shall be no later than three months from the date that this order 
      becomes final. 
       
   3. Dr. Noriega pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,950, within six months 
      of the date of this order. 
       
On December 22, 2011, the Divisional Court ordered that the Discipline Committee’s 
December 7, 2011 penalty Order be stayed and that Dr. Noriega be permitted to practise 
under the terms of his July 22, 2009 undertaking pending the appeal. 
 
On July 9, 2012, the Divisional Court allowed Dr. Noriega’s appeal and returned the 
matter for rehearing before a differently constituted panel. Dr. Noriega will continue to 
practise under the terms of his July 22, 2009 undertaking pending the disposition of the 
hearing. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 09 Jul 2012
Hearing Date(s): September 15-17, October 13, November 5, 2010


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Nov 2003
Summary:

 The Discipline Committee finds that Dr. Eleazar Humberto Noriega engaged in an act or acts of 
 professional misconduct under paragraph 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code which 
 is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, in that 
 he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; 

The Discipline Committee finds that Dr. Noriega 
 committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 
 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.

Therefore the Discipline Committee 
 Orders and directs that:

1.	Dr. Noriega to attend before the Discipline Committee to be 
 reprimanded;

2.	that Dr. Noriega(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 18 
 months commencing on a date to be set by the Registrar between January 1 and February 14, 2004, 
 nine months of which shall be suspended if Dr. Noriega successfully completes the College Medical 
 Ethics and Informed Consent Course and the College Boundary Course; 

3.	that Dr. Noriega will not 
 examine any female patient unless accompanied by a member of the College of Nurses of Ontario or 
 the CPSO, or where the patient is less than 12 years of age, a parent or guardian; and

4.	that 
 the results of this proceeding be included in the Register.

* At the completion of the hearing 
 Dr. Noriega waived his right to appeal and the reprimand was administered. *

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 24, 2003