Norkus, Daiva Labanauskaite (CPSO#: 68083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Kaunas Medical Institute, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1004
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 767-7725
Fax: (416) 767-9959
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daiva Norkus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Norkus ( CPSO# 68083 )

Business Address:
Suite 1004
1243 Islington Avenue
Islington Square
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 767-7725

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAIVA LABANAUSKAITE NORKUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORKUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996