Norman, Conolly Stewart (CPSO#: 41328)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Dublin, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995