Norman, Nadine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 66958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 316
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-7779
Fax: (416) 439-6128
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 462-2000 Ext. 2610
Fax: (416) 461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Nadine Norman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Norman ( CPSO# 66958 )

Business Address:
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 316
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-7779

Business Address:
Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE ELIZABETH NORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998