Norman, Tanya Lynne (CPSO#: 77605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mapleton Health Centre
11 Andrews Drive West
Drayton ON  N0G 1P0
Phone: (519) 638-3088
Fax: (519) 638-3982
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. L. Norman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Norman ( CPSO# 77605 )

Business Address:
Mapleton Health Centre
11 Andrews Drive West
Drayton ON  N0G 1P0
Phone Number: (519) 638-3088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA LYNNE NORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004