Noronha, Charles Anthony (CPSO#: 66147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 6C5
Phone: (705) 878-5551
Fax: (705) 878-8455
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Noronha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Noronha ( CPSO# 66147 )

Business Address:
86 Angeline Street South
Suite 203
Lindsay ON  K9V 6C5
Phone Number: (705) 878-5551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ANTHONY NORONHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORONHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2006