Noronha, Lionel John (CPSO#: 62505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stirling Medical Centre
9C Tuftsville Road
R R 4
Stirling ON  K0K 3E0
Phone: (613) 395-5566
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lionel Noronha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noronha ( CPSO# 62505 )

Business Address:
Striling Medical Centre
9C Tuftsville Road
R R 4
Stirling ON  K0K 3E0
Phone Number: (613) 395-5566

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIONEL JOHN NORONHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORONHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1991