Norris, Brian Douglas (CPSO#: 27619)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1999