Norris, Desmond (CPSO#: 29145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3630
Fax: (705) 759-3693
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Desmond Norris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Norris ( CPSO# 29145 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3630

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Zambia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DESMOND NORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977