Norris, Erin Beth (CPSO#: 79059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
3 - 057 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5420
Fax: (416) 864-5139
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Norris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Norris ( CPSO# 79059 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
3 - 057 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 30 Nov 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN BETH NORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2008