Norris, Mireille Amelie (CPSO#: 70932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Women's College Centre
Unit HG39
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4076
Fax: (416) 480-4778
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mireille Norris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2008


Corporation Name: Dr. Mireille Norris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Norris ( CPSO# 70932 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook & Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
HG39 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIREILLE AMELIE NORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Feb 1999
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 13 Feb 2000
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1998