Norris, Phillip Duncan (CPSO#: 56575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital LHSC.
Room B8-118
800 Commissions Rd. East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685 8500 Ext. 55412
Fax: (519) 667 6539
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinic 528
528 Dundas St.
London ON  N6B 1W6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-1533
Fax: (519) 645-1536
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. D. Norris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Norris ( CPSO# 56575 )

Business Address:
Clinic 528
528 Dundas Street
London ON  N6B 1W6
Phone Number: (518) 965-1533

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
B8-118 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP DUNCAN NORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1986