Norris, Sandhaya (CPSO#: 77879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: Wadhawan, Sandhaya (used until: 04 Jul 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Dept of Psychiatry
Box 400
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 795 5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Norris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Norris ( CPSO# 77879 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Box 400
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 795-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDHAYA NORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 31 Oct 2006 to 22 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007