North, Robert Harold (CPSO#: 19708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone: (905) 459-5335
Fax: (905) 459-3861
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert H. North Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. North ( CPSO# 19708 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone Number: (905) 459-5335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT HAROLD NORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1965