Northan, Allan Albert (CPSO#: 26369)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014