Northcott, Sandra Joy (CPSO#: 67917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room F4-218
550 Wellington Road
Parkwood Institute -
Mental Health Care Building
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47686
Fax: (519) 455-4392
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Aug 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA JOY NORTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTHCOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 11 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 20 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1999