Northey, Robert Alexander William (CPSO#: 66960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K2P 0H3
Phone: (613) 237-4452
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ALEXANDER WILLIAM NORTHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTHEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999