Noseworthy, Mary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 75640)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2003