Nosheen, Saadia (CPSO#: 100535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Rawalpindi Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4900
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kansas
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 May 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Saadia Nosheen may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.