Notarandrea, Edoardo (CPSO#: 63799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883-2041
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edoardo Notarandrea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Notarandrea ( CPSO# 63799 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDOARDO NOTARANDREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTARANDREA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992