Notkin, Robert Mark (CPSO#: 57503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
5700 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4K2
Phone: (416) 490-8347
Fax: (416) 490-0953
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MARK NOTKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTKIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)