Nour, Emad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 70837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 fourth ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 45000
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Nour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nour ( CPSO# 70837 )

Business Address:
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMAD IBRAHIM NOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2004 to 18 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000