Nourhosseini, Seyed Hamid (CPSO#: 76636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 770-1800
Fax: (905) 237-4386
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health hospital
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill, ON L4C 4Z3
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-2310
Fax: (905) 237-4386
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid Nourhosseini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nourhosseini ( CPSO# 76636 )

Business Address:
407 - 250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 770-1800

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYED HAMID NOURHOSSEINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOURHOSSEINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006