Novak, Rudolf (CPSO#: 78564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:University of Comenius, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
1265 East Arthur Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 622-0055
Fax: (807) 622-6333
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rudolf Novak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Novak ( CPSO# 78564 )

Business Address:
1265 East Arthur Street
Suite 407
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 622-0055

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUDOLF NOVAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOVAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008