Novak, Tomas (CPSO#: 32469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tomas Novak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Novak ( CPSO# 32469 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMAS NOVAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOVAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1981