Novice, Fred Mark (CPSO#: 52761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: Nowice, Fred Mark (used until: 13 Apr 1988 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3600 Rhodes Drive
Windsor ON  N8W 5A4
Phone: (519) 258-5020
Fax: (519) 252-5368
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Oklahoma

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRED MARK NOVICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOVICE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984