Novick, Richard Joel (CPSO#: 60273)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard J. Novick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: L H S C Health Records 339 Windermere Road London, ON N6A 5A5 Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 35842
Date Received: 07 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2014