Nowaczyk, Malgorzata Joanna (CPSO#: 62504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Genetics HHSC - 3N16
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73042
Fax: (905) 521-2651
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALGORZATA JOANNA NOWACZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWACZYK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991