Nowaczynski, Mark John Joseph (CPSO#: 62280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
House Calls: Interdisciplinary
healthcare for homebound seniors
2nd Floor
140 Merton Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Phone: (416) 481-5099
Fax: (416) 481-2590
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOHN JOSEPH NOWACZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWACZYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1991