Nowak, Jozef Edward (CPSO#: 72830)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 13 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2006