Nowak, Justyna Maria Monica (CPSO#: 71536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenwood Medical Centre
496 Discovery Avenue, unit 10
Kingston
Kingston ON  K7K 7E9
Phone: (613) 507-7003
Fax: (613) 507-7006
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Nowak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nowak ( CPSO# 71536 )

Business Address:
Greenwood Medical Centre
10-496 Discovery Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 7E9
Phone Number: (613) 507-7003

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTYNA MARIA MONICA NOWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001