Nowak, Mary Barbara (CPSO#: 53021)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 301 10 Unionville Gate Markham ON L3R 0W7
Date Received: 12 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017