Nowicki, Aleksandra Agnieszka (CPSO#: 83486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC
800 Commissionders Rd. E.
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52534
Fax: (519) 685-8595
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

231 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2L3
Canada
Phone: (519) 963-0620
Fax: (519) 963-0621
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.A. Nowicki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nowicki ( CPSO# 83486 )

Business Address:
LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
231 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 963-0620

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA AGNIESZKA NOWICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWICKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010