Noy, Janet Lee (CPSO#: 71342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1212
Fax: (807) 623-2316
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET LEE NOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999