Nrusimhadevara, Ravikrishna (CPSO#: 79364)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Utkal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004