Nugent, Nathan Zane (CPSO#: 79686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Defence Research and Development
Canada
Toronto Research Centre
1133 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3K 2C9
Phone: 416-635-2000 Ext. 2014
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN ZANE NUGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUGENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016