Nugent, Robert William (CPSO#: 66632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nelson Medicine Professional Corp
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone: (807) 274-3287
Fax: (807) 274-7882
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nugent ( CPSO# 66632 )
Dr. S. Elkheir ( CPSO# 98789 )
Dr. J. Nelson ( CPSO# 55513 )
Dr. L. Jenks ( CPSO# 55667 )
Dr. B. Anderson ( CPSO# 69844 )
Dr. M. Halvorsen ( CPSO# 100103)
Dr. K. Eltawil ( CPSO# 97650 )
Dr. V. Patel ( CPSO# 108275)
Dr. M. Ruppenstein ( CPSO# 98445 )
Dr. M. Kowal ( CPSO# 100791)

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-3287

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Business Address:
1460 Idylwild Drive
RMB 2004 RR#2
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M3

Business Address:
310 Nelson Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1B1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7708


Corporation Name: Robert Nugent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nugent ( CPSO# 66632 )

Business Address:
Nelson Medicine Professional Corp
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7741

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM NUGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUGENT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995