Nugent, Zoe Sara (CPSO#: 88369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal Free Hospital School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6842
Fax: (705) 740-6897
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: King Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Nugent ( CPSO# 88369 )
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 87155 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
420 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3R5
Phone Number: (705) 745-5464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOE SARA NUGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUGENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014