Numair, Huma Naheed (CPSO#: 81890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437 Ext. 2040
Fax: (905) 639-0608
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dundas Medical Centre
And Walk In Clinic
252 Dundas Street East SS 2
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H4
Canada
Phone: (905) 689-8833
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

252 dundas street east
Waterdown ON  L9H 7K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 689-8833
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Huma Numair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Numair ( CPSO# 81890 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 592-3946

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUMA NAHEED NUMAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUMAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 02 Nov 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Nov 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006