Nunez, Matias (CPSO#: 18417)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Madrid, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1959
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001