Nurse, William Ewart (CPSO#: 23859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 May 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2001
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 May 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 May 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 7, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. William Ewart Nurse
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario by Dr. Nurse:

                  I, Dr. William Ewart Nurse, undertake that I will:
                  
                  1.    restrict my medical practice to assisting at surgery only when
                        another member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
                        is the most responsible physician, effective June 30, 2001;
                  2.    notify the Quality Assurance Committee of the College of Physicians
                        and Surgeons of Ontario (the College) if I wish to return to active
                        obstetrics and gynecology practice, and acknowledge that, in order
                        to return to practice, I will be required to participate in
                        remediation acceptable to the Quality Assurance Committee and to be
                        reassessed in a physician review program, obtaining a result which
                        is acceptable to the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.