Nuth, Janet Elizabeth (CPSO#: 57077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective Assoc
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Osmond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Osmond ( CPSO# 56913 )
Dr. J. Nuth ( CPSO# 57077 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH NUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989