Nutik, Melissa Robyn (CPSO#: 71397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
4th Floor Box 25
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5158
Fax: (416) 586-3175
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ROBYN NUTIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUTIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2000