Nutt, Samantha Joan (CPSO#: 67887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
77 Grenville Street
3rd and 4th Floors
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JOAN NUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997