Nwaesei, Chukwuma Gabriel (CPSO#: 51589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo, Russian, Yoruba

Education:Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 255-2467
Fax: (519) 255-1735
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chukwuma Gabriel Nwaesei, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nwaesei ( CPSO# 51589 )

Business Address:
c/o Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 255-2467

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHUKWUMA GABRIEL NWAESEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWAESEI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1987