Nzau, Duncun Munyao Muoki (CPSO#: 77124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Oct 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish, Kaamba, Russian, Swahili

Education:Leningradskij Sanitarno Gigieniceskij Me, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Neurosurgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4228
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 27 Oct 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2001 to 02 Oct 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2002 to 02 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2003 to 02 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Duncun  Munyao  Muoki  Nzau  may  practise medicine independently in
                  pediatric neurosurgery, only.