O'Beirne, Carole Patricia (CPSO#: 71351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6333
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sick Kids Hospital
Division of Pediatric Medicine
Community Pediatrics Section
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carole O'Beirne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Beirne ( CPSO# 71351 )

Business Address:
Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 696-0003

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLE PATRICIA O'BEIRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BEIRNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2002