O'Blenes, Catherine Amy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 76460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone: 905-727-0285
Fax: 905-726-8208
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 11 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE AMY ELIZABETH O'BLENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BLENES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2015